Accounts and annual returns AL-SUNNAH COMMUNITY EDUCATION AND RECREATION CENTRE

Charity number: 1121624
Charity reporting is overdue by 42 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 31 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 42 days
Annual return 31 May 2023 31 July 2024 122 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 31 July 2024 122 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2022 03 July 2023 94 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 03 July 2023 94 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 06 May 2022 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 06 May 2022 36 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 11 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 11 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window