FIRST STEPS DERBYSHIRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
All ages. Counselling, peer support, self help groups, online support . Parents & carers workshops. Body Image sessions in schools. Creative groups, Exercise support. Intensive community support in partnership with NHS. Support services at the Universities of Nottingham, Nottingham Trent, Derby & Loughborough. Opportunities for volunteering/work/student placements. Training for professionals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
Total income includes £292,033 from 4 government contract(s) and £9,870 from 3 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Derby City
- Derbyshire
- Leicestershire
- Nottingham City
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 03 December 2007: Standard registration
- 10 February 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 10 February 2021: Funds transferred to 1185092 FIRST STEPS ED
- FIRST STEPS (Working name)
- FIRST STEPS DERBY (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £431.22k | £482.95k | £487.83k | £517.06k | £494.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £364.79k | £437.63k | £430.94k | £434.25k | £1.01m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £168.00k | £0 | £163.59k | £295.96k | £292.03k | |
|
Income from government grants | £210.00k | £322.97k | £127.61k | N/A | £9.87k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £15.12k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £491.63k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.88k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £7.44k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £423.84k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £10.42k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 November 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 05 February 2020 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 05 February 2020 | 5 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 28 September 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 28 September 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 31 August 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2017
(These accounts |
31 August 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 FEBRUARY 2007 AS AMENDED 29 MAY 2007 AND 30 APRIL 2009
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF ANY CHARITABLE NEED OF THOSE SUFFERING FROM ANOREXIA NERVOSA, BULIMIA NERVOSA, BINGE EATING, COMPULSIVE EATING OR ANY OTHER EATING DISORDERS BY PROVIDING INFORMATION, ADVICE AND SUPPORT. 2. THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF FAMILIES AND CARERS OF THOSE SUFFERING FROM EATING DISORDERS BY PROVIDING INFORMATION AND SUPPORT. 3. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROVIDING TRAINING FOR PROFESSIONALS AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC...
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window