ABBEY PHYSIC COMMUNITY GARDEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To help our members and the wider public maintain or improve their physical and mental health and wellbeing, build diverse skills and confidence, reduce social isolation and connect with their community. Through our commitment to equality and diversity and provision of inclusive services and support we aim to break down the stigma of mental ill health and build understanding and empathy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 01 June 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Jane Carr | Chair | 18 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Wood | Trustee | 28 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP WYARD | Trustee | 28 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kate Bowman | Trustee | 28 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Imogen Armstrong | Trustee | 30 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Ireland | Trustee | 30 June 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £149.90k | £153.77k | £84.02k | £105.70k | £183.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £92.20k | £100.15k | £118.48k | £141.25k | £138.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.23k | £10.90k | £3.89k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30/11/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/05/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/05/2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED ARE TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WITH MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEMS IN THE COUNTY OF KENT, OR TO PROVIDE RELIEF TO THOSE WHO ARE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF HORTICULTURE AND GARDENING FACILITIES AND TRAINING SO AS TO STRENGTHEN THEIR CONFIDENCE AND SELF-ESTEEM IN ORDER TO SUPPORT THEM TO RE-INTEGRATE INTO THE WIDER COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
KENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Abbey Physic Community Garden
Abbey Place
FAVERSHAM
Kent
ME13 7BG
- Phone:
- 01795539115
- Email:
- abbeyphysic@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
abbeyphysic.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window