THE ABBOTT FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General charitable purposes
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 April 2007: Standard registration
- 09 January 2014: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.71k | £5.96k | £0 | £1 | £8.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.29k | £5.93k | £0 | £0 | £1.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 12 July 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 11 October 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | 21 September 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 8 JANUARY 2007
Charitable objects
1) TO APPLY THE INCOME, AND ALL OR SUCH PARTS OF THE CAPITAL, AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT (WHETHER THROUGH DONATIONS TO OTHER CHARITIES OR BY ANY OTHER CHARITABLE MEANS) FOR OR TOWARDS SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT. 2) THE TRUSTEES MUST USE THE INCOME AND MAY USE THE CAPITAL OF THE CHARITY IN PROMOTING THE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window