HAY CAT RESCUE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CARING FOR AND RE-HOMING UNWANTED CATS AND KITTENS. FUNDRAISING TO SUPPORT THIS WORK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Herefordshire
- Powys
Governance
- 25 July 2007: Standard registration
- 23 April 2021: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 23 April 2021: Funds transferred to 293787 CELIA HAMMOND ANIMAL TRUST
No other names
- Conflicting interests
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.64k | £5.43k | £16.98k | £8.80k | £11.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.04k | £5.55k | £11.52k | £12.99k | £11.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 12 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 09 May 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 JUNE 2007.
Charitable objects
TO PREVENT AND RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF CATS WHO ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BECAUSE THEY ARE UNWANTED, STRAY, HAVE BEEN ABANDONED, NEGLECTED OR MALTREATED, IN PARTICULAR BY ARRANGING FOR ANY VETERINARY TREATMENT REQUIRED, INCLUDING NEUTERING, AND PROVIDING SHELTER AND MAKING ARRANGEMENTS FOR THEIR ADOPTION; TO PROMOTE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE HAY-ON-WYE (HEREFORDSHIRE, POWYS)
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.