HINDU CULTURAL SOCIETY OF BRADFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the social, cultural, religious and educational aspirations of Hindus living in Bradford, with a clear vision to develop a more cohesive and sustainable community by building partnerships with the local people of Bradford and the region.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

17 Trustee(s)
17 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bradford City
Governance
- 26 April 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr SURESH TAILOR | Chair | 24 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rakesh Sharma | Trustee | 28 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rajnish Ahuja | Trustee | 08 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Vinay Verma | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Deepak Krishan Shukla | Trustee | 24 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
ASHOK KUMAR NAIR | Trustee | 24 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Satish Khatri | Trustee | 24 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Puneet Kumar Tyagi | Trustee | 24 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
RAMESH GOYAL | Trustee | 19 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
MUKESH KUMAR CHAWLA | Trustee | 19 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Natvarlal Taylor | Trustee | 26 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kumarvel Kurusamy | Trustee | 22 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
SANTOSH GUPTA | Trustee | 26 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
KAMALJIT SHARMA | Trustee | 22 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
PHOOLAN BALDEV VIG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SAMYKKURUKKAL BALAKRISHNAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BALDEV KRISHEN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £243.62k | £153.17k | £187.27k | £188.32k | £266.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £143.69k | £93.08k | £103.32k | £108.81k | £129.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £43.05k | £13.68k | £10.56k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 JANUARY 2007. as amended on 19 Jun 2016 as amended on 18 Nov 2018 as amended on 22 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE HINDU DHARMA AND THE DOCTRINES AND OBSERVATIONS THAT SERVE TO PROMOTE AND MANIFEST THE SAID DHARMA BY THE ESTABLISHMENT, SUPPORT AND OPERATION OF A HINDU TEMPLE. B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE TRADITIONS OF THE HINDU DHARMA, THE HINDU LANGUAGE AND HINDU FESTIVALS BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND OPERATION OF A HINDU CULTURAL CENTRE. C) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF BRADFORD AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECTS OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS. D) THE CHARITY WILL BE NON-PARTY IN POLITICS AND WILL NOT DISCRIMINATE AGAINST ANYONE ON THE GROUNDS OF AGE, GENDER, RACE RELIGION OR DISABILITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE BRADFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
341
LEEDS ROAD
BRADFORD
BRADFORD
BD3 9JY
- Phone:
- 01274395603
- Email:
- INFO@BRADFORDMANDIR.ORG
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window