Accounts and annual returns THE INTERNATIONAL ACADEMY OF ORAL ONCOLOGY

Charity Number: 1119102
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2012 22 February 2012 On Time
Annual return 30 April 2011 16 January 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2011 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2010 31 October 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2010 25 October 2010 On Time
Annual return 30 April 2009 30 June 2010 122 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2009 29 July 2009 On Time