Q YORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
OPEN MEETINGS FOR ALL AGES FOR THE PURPOSE OF EVANGELISM, TEACHING AND INSTRUCTION IN THE CHRISTIAN FAITH. MEETINGS AND ACTIVITIES FOR THE 5-11 YEARS. MEETINGS AND ACTIVITIES FOR THE 11-16 YEARS. MEETINGS AND ACTIVITIES FOR THE OVER 55 YEARS. MEETINGS AND ACTIVITIES FOR MEN AND WOMEN. PASTORAL CARE. DANCE ACADEMY. FOOD/CLOTHING FOR THE UNDER PRIVILEGED. PILLARS CAFE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 22 May 2007: Standard registration
- ROCK OF YORK (Previous name)
- THE ROCK CHURCH (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Inkley | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Clare Louise Palmer | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
MICHAEL CHARLES FOX | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £110.11k | £93.49k | £95.68k | £96.55k | £85.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £309.29k | £201.95k | £197.85k | £133.09k | £138.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.16k | £10.50k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 03 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 03 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 03 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 03 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 19 OCTOBER 2006 AS AMENDED 13 FEBRUARY 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31 JAN 2018
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; (B) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT;AND (C) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE YORK
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Priory Street
YORK
YO1 6ET
- Phone:
- 01904 659475
- Email:
- info@qyork.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window