Financial history UK FRIENDS OF YALE UNIVERSITY LIMITED

Charity number: 1119399
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £475.41k £364.54k £166.75k £1.18m £1.02m
Total expenditure £669.44k £382.63k £163.50k £1.15m £1.05m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £1.18m £1.02m
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £1.67k £42
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £847.45k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £1.15m £1.05m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £3.75k £3.75k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £1.14m £1.04m
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £5.82k