Accounts and annual returns THE OLD WILLOW WORKS LIMITED

Charity number: 1122145
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2010 27 September 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2009 29 January 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not Required