ST THOMAS' INDIAN ORTHODOX CHURCH LONDON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting religious educational and cultural activities of special groups like children, youth and women. Carrying out service activities and charity for the benefit of members of the church
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

15 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bedford
- Buckinghamshire
- Central Bedfordshire
- Hertfordshire
- Slough
- Surrey
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Throughout London
Governance
- 16 April 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Anoop Malayil | Chair | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Joshua | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Grace Raju | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mathew Varghese | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Deny Chacko | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Libu Abraham | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shiji Thomas | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Santhosh Kurian | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Roy Varghese | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ajai Sam | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charls Raju | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Varghese Koruthu | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cijine John | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Geevarghese Thomas | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
SHIBU PAUL | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £135.60k | £80.24k | £56.70k | £205.41k | £225.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £78.08k | £76.15k | £59.68k | £124.78k | £104.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 April 2024 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 April 2024 | 64 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 September 2022 | 236 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2021
(These accounts |
24 September 2022 | 236 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 June 2021 | 122 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 June 2021 | 122 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 JANUARY 2007.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ORTHODOX CHRISTIAN FAITH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE MIDDLESEX, HARTFORDSHIRE, BEDFORDSHIRE, BUCKINGHAMSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Thomas Indian Orthodox Church
St. Agnells Lane
Hemel Hempstead
HP2 7AY
- Phone:
- 07454190013
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window