MSIZI AFRICA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To enable more promising futures for children in Lesotho through the use of food and food related programs and to make grants relevant to this objective at the discretion of the trustees.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Lesotho
Governance
- 06 June 2007: Standard registration
- MANTS'ASE CHILDREN'S HOME (Working name)
- MANTS'ASE CHILDREN'S HOME UK (Working name)
- MANTS'ASE CHILDREN'S HOME UK (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chris Roberts | Trustee | 05 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Miles | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Wood | Trustee | 06 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Daphne Kasambala | Trustee | 25 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
LUCY ELIZABETH HERRON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55.37k | £90.24k | £56.79k | £40.74k | £34.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £70.61k | £52.26k | £50.99k | £46.53k | £38.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 25 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 February 2024 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 February 2024 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1 MAY 2007 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEEDS DATED 28 APRIL 2008, 2 JANUARY 2009 AND 28 JULY 2009.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH AND RELIEVE THE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN AFRICA BY ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF GRANTS AND MONEY, GOODS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES.
Area of benefit
AFRICA
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Park Lane
SEVENOAKS
Kent
TN13 3up
- Phone:
- 07989963229
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window