Governing document Transform NE

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28 FEBRUARY 2007 AS AMENDED 19 MARCH 2007 AND 24 FEB 2008 BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION. AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 15 JUN 2016 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 30 SEP 2016 as amended on 15 Sep 2023 as amended on 15 Sep 2023
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; (B) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT. (C) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM OR WALES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.