Financial history LONDON BOROUGH OF SUTTON NEIGHBOURHOOD WATCH

Charity Number: 1120448
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £3.00k £1 £4.05k £4.07k
Total expenditure £1.86k £220 £1.44k £2.22k £5.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A