Trustees THE UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE - HAXBY AND WIGGINTON
Charity number: 1118861
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paula Wills | Trustee | 27 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Elizabeth Ball | Trustee | 27 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Margaret Edwards | Trustee | 20 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||
MAXINE KUTLER | Trustee | 20 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||
CHRISTOPHER NORMAN JAQUES | Trustee | 20 October 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||
ANNE HYSTED | Trustee | 21 October 2022 |
|
|||||||||||||
Jennifer Mary Rutland | Trustee | 22 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Judith Moore | Trustee | 22 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Michael Calvert | Trustee | 20 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Gordon Rex Moore | Trustee | 20 November 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.