THE PAUL TRIGWELL MEMORIAL FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To receive donations from fund-raising activities and to award grants to support the education of children 4-18 years of age on the Isle of Sheppey, Kent, in particularly but not exclusively of those who are socially and economically disadvantaged.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kent
Governance
- 01 August 2007: Standard registration
- 15 March 2022: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 15 March 2022: Funds transferred to 1182633 CURLY'S LEGACY
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2017 | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.60k | £74 | £3.02k | £282 | £253 | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.87k | £8.14k | £10.91k | £4.64k | £4.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 01 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 14 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2018 | 04 February 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 MARCH 2007 AS AMENDED 28 JUNE 2007
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AGED 4 - 18 YEARS OF AGE ON THE ISLE OF SHEPPEY, IN PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY OF THOSE WHO ARE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED.
Area of benefit
ISLE OF SHEPPEY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window