Financial history BARKING MUSIC AND DRAMA

Charity number: 1120812
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £26.53k £3.99k £10.49k £19.91k £24.38k
Total expenditure £29.12k £891 £7.32k £21.71k £23.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A