BARKING MUSIC AND DRAMA

Charity number: 1120812
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

(i) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF BARKING AND DAGENHAM AND ALL THOSE CHILDREN ATTENDING JUNIOR TRINITY COLLEGE IN THE SUBJECT OF MUSIC BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL SUPPORT TO FURTHER THEIR EDUCATION. (ii) TO ADVANCE THE PUBLICS EDUCATION IN AMATEUR DRAMATICS THROUGH ACTIVE PARTICIPATION AND THE TEACHING OF MUSIC AND DRAMA"

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £24,376
Total expenditure: £23,221

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 September 2007: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Zoe Paterson Chair 10 June 2022
None on record
Lucy Thompson Trustee 29 April 2025
None on record
Jennifer Akroyd Trustee 28 April 2025
None on record
SCOTT DEXTER-WYER Trustee 27 June 2023
None on record
Faye Spooner Trustee 21 April 2022
None on record
Simon Thompson Trustee 21 April 2022
None on record
Anthony Patrick O'Connell Trustee 01 April 2014
None on record
ANTHONY MARTIN LUCAS Trustee
None on record
Stephen Gilson Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £26.53k £3.99k £10.49k £19.91k £24.38k
Total expenditure £29.12k £891 £7.32k £21.71k £23.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 22 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 27 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 27 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 08 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
22 Craigdale Road
HORNCHURCH
Essex
RM11 1AE
Phone:
07960753748