THE CONFEDERATION OF HEALING ORGANISATIONS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides education, healer training, medical profession interface, information for public and institutions, a public register of complementary practitioners, support for Members. Funds Research. Increases public and professional awareness of Healing as a complementary therapy alongside mainstream medicine. Promotes employment of healers in hospitals, primary care, hospices and nursing homes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 06 June 2007: Standard registration
- 29 May 2018: Funds received from 1123644 INSTITUTE FOR COMPLEMENTARY AND NATURAL MEDICINE
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alison Jane McWhinnie | Trustee | 08 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Melissa Jane Smith | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Alexandra Mason | Trustee | 15 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
CRAIG NIGEL REBUCK | Trustee | 09 March 2021 |
|
|||||
DAVID BALEN CERT PFS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.61k | £38.47k | £164.51k | £91.96k | £49.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £73.80k | £47.53k | £47.21k | £75.53k | £75.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 11 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 11 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 22 July 2024 | 83 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 22 July 2024 | 83 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 15 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 15 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 11 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 11 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 19 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 19 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16 FEBRUARY 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 11 MAY 2007 AND BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 26 JANUARY 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/10/2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE HEALTH BY PROMOTING HIGH STANDARDS IN HEALING FOR THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR BY: 1) PROVIDING INFORMATION ON HEALING TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC; 2) SUPPORTING AND PROVIDING EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN HEALING; AND 3) ESTABLISHING AND MAINTAINING PROPER STANDARDS OF PRACTICE IN HEALING
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Combedene
Coombe Hill
Keinton Mandeville
SOMERTON
Somerset
TA11 6DY
- Phone:
- 01749685000
- Email:
- admin@the-cho.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window