Financial history PROCLAIMERS

Charity number: 1120306
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £508.08k £420.07k £491.50k £468.21k £478.01k
Total expenditure £454.46k £403.53k £468.11k £491.49k £513.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £45.93k £64.30k £15.57k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £376.30k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £131.78k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £454.46k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £17.32k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A