PROCLAIMERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A 21st Century Church based in Norwich and Ipswich, UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- 27 July 2007: Standard registration
- 13 May 2021: Funds received from 1059036 HOPE FOR LATVIA
- Proclaimers T/A The Space (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Abeku Mensah | Trustee | 13 May 2025 |
|
|||||
Jonathan Loades | Trustee | 13 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
David Paul Middleton | Trustee | 26 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr HELENA Temple-REDDISH | Trustee | 17 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
MARK HODDER | Trustee | 17 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
BOBBY THOMAS RAWLS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £508.08k | £420.07k | £491.50k | £468.21k | £478.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £454.46k | £403.53k | £468.11k | £491.49k | £513.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £45.93k | £64.30k | £15.57k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £376.30k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £131.78k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £454.46k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £17.32k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 7 FEBRUARY 2007
Charitable objects
A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY THE PROCLAMATION AND FURTHERANCE OF THE GOSPEL OF GOD CONCERNING HIS SON JESUS CHRIST THE LORD AND THE PREACHING AND TEACHING OF THE WORD OF GOD BY THE PROCLAIMERS CHURCH IN NORWICH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH AS APPROVED BY THE DIRECTORS FROM TIME TO TIME (THE STATEMENT) B) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS SHALL FURTHER THE ATTAINMENT OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY OR ANY OF THEM C) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY IN THE SAID LOCALITY AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS FROM TIME TO TIME THOUGHT FIT
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE SPACE
ROUNDTREE WAY
NORWICH
NR7 8SQ
- Phone:
- 01603484630
- Email:
- office@proclaimers.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window