S.O.U.P. SINCERE OFFERINGS FOR UNAPPRECIATED PERSONS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SOUP provide an outreach service to individuals who are suffering from extreme isolation and are beyond reach of traditional charities who have no family or friends and scarce financial security by providing material and Mental health support. Fundraising and grants for other charities by organising Wellness events and concerts. Mental health support programmes for staff of other charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 08 October 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bedford
- Birmingham City
- Cambridgeshire
- City Of London
- City Of York
- Derbyshire
- Hertfordshire
- Middlesbrough
- Pembrokeshire
- Shropshire
- Russia
- Scotland
- Sri Lanka
Governance
- 30 November 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr S H Bindunie Sirimanne | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
DARREN ROWLAND | Trustee | 18 November 2007 |
|
|
||||
TRUSHA PATEL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 08/10/2019 | 08/10/2020 | 08/10/2021 | 08/10/2022 | 08/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.02k | £6.80k | £2.90k | £692 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.41k | £6.91k | £3.22k | £1.10k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 08 October 2023 | 17 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 08 October 2022 | 28 August 2023 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 08 October 2021 | 05 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 08 October 2020 | 06 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 08 October 2019 | 02 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 OCTOBER 2007
Charitable objects
1 THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT, INCLUDING ASSISTANT TO FIND EMPLOYMENT. 2 TO RELIEVE ELDERLY PEOPLE RESIDENT IN MIDDLESEX, HERTFORDSHIRE, BEDFORDSHIRE AND ELSEWHERE WHO ARE IN NEED BY PROVIDING ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PERSONS. 3 TO ASSIST IN THE TREATMENT AND CARE OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL OR PHYSICAL ILLNESS OF ANY DESCRIPTION OR IN NEED OF REHABILITATION AS A RESULT OF SUCH ILLNESS, BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION.
Area of benefit
MIDDLESEX, HERTFORDSHIRE, BEDFORDSHIRE AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 printers avenue
533 whippendell road
watford
HERTS
WD187QF
- Phone:
- 07599945190
- Email:
- soupcharity@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window