THE COPSE LEISURE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activities of the Charity is to promote recreation or other leisure time occupation for individuals who live in the Parish of Burghill.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 18 April 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SALLY JANE ROBERTSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Colin Derrick Reynolds | Trustee | 27 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Darren Richard Campbell Coates | Trustee | 03 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARK ELLIS | Trustee | 25 September 2013 |
|
|||||
EMMA NOBLE | Trustee | 25 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
IAN JOHN WATKINS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHIRLEY DIANE STOKES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.14k | £13.94k | £19.26k | £7.34k | £12.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.63k | £5.37k | £7.83k | £9.81k | £10.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £16.10k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 MARCH 2006.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF BURGHILL IN HEREFORDSHIRE THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY, DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE, IRRESPECTIVE OF NATIONALITY, RACE, ETHICAL OR NATIONAL ORIGIN, COLOUR, DISABILITY, AGE, SEXUALITY, POLITICAL OR RELIGIOUS BELIEFS IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE DOING OF ALL SUCH OTHER THINGS AS ARE INCIDENTAL OR CONDUCIVE TO THE ATTAINMENT OF THESE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF BURGHILL IN HEREFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 BAKERS FURLONG
BURGHILL
HEREFORD
HR4 7SB
- Phone:
- 01432760878
- Email:
- sal.rob@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window