NEW LIFE CHURCH MILTON KEYNES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trust is established to: advance Christianity in accordance with the doctrines of the faith; relieve people who are in charitable need, because of sickness or poor health, age, financial hardship or some other reason; promote and provide education (including vocational training); promote such other charitable objects as the trustees from time to time determine.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income:
£1,177,913
Donations and legacies | £810.11k | |
Charitable activities | £68.87k | |
Other trading activities | £289.01k | |
Investments | £9.92k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,077,242
Raising funds | £223.78k | |
Charitable activities | £853.47k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £223.78k | |
Charitable expenditure | £853.47k | |
Retained for future use | £100.67k |
People

30 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
250 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Buckinghamshire
- Milton Keynes
- Brazil
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Germany
- Macedonia
- Philippines
- Tanzania
Governance
- 11 May 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Richard Wightman | Trustee | 18 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Ojefemi Bolajii Ojemuyiwa | Trustee | 18 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Linda Grabs | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Simon Gordon Halford | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Sharon Jill Clark | Trustee | 21 November 2017 |
|
|||||
Tim Williams | Trustee | 18 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
FRANK HUGH CLARK | Trustee | 22 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
DAVID SAMUEL EYEINGTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.13m | £1.10m | £968.24k | £1.11m | £1.18m | |
|
Total expenditure | £844.19k | £840.61k | £759.92k | £960.13k | £1.08m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £53.12k | £5.18k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.07m | £975.40k | £803.08k | £822.53k | £810.11k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £236.42k | £289.01k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £59.50k | £74.50k | £111.91k | £54.53k | £68.87k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £101 | £649 | £132 | £577 | £9.92k | |
|
Income - Other | £1.80k | £47.54k | £53.12k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £844.19k | £840.61k | £239.02k | £805.67k | £853.47k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £520.89k | £154.46k | £223.78k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £37.44k | £40.89k | £2.40k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £55.12k | £77.98k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £3.18m | £3.20m | £3.11m | £3.05m | £3.10m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £1 | £1 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £425.31k | £631.56k | £740.89k | £915.78k | £941.50k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.33m | £1.30m | £1.14m | £1.09m | £1.06m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 29 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 29 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 20 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 20 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 28 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 28 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 08 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 08 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 27 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 27 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15/03/2007 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 16/03/2012
Charitable objects
3.1 TO ADVANCE CHRISTIANITY IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PROVISIONS OF CLAUSE 10 OF THIS MEMORANDUM IN THE AREA OF MILTON KEYNES AND ELSEWHERE 3.2 TO RELIEVE PEOPLE WHO ARE IN CHARITABLE NEED BECAUSE OF 2.2.2.1 SICKNESS OR POOR HEALTH 2.2.2.2 AGE 2.2.2.3 FINANCIAL HARDSHIP 2.2.2.4 OR SOME OTHER REASON BY ANY PROPER MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT AND INCLUDING (WHERE APPROPRIATE BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION) THE PROVISION OF ADVICE; THE PROMOTION OF GOOD PRACTICES TO COMBAT SUCH CONDITIONS AND THE PROVISION OF RESOURCES TO ALLEVIATE OR PREVENT SUCH NEED 3.3 TO PROMOTE OR PROVIDE EDUCATION (INCLUDING VOCATIONAL TRAINING) 3.4 TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Area of benefit
MILTON KEYNES AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE RIDGEWAY CENTRE
FEATHERSTONE ROAD
MK12 5TH
- Phone:
- 01908224580
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window