Accounts and annual returns ASAMAI MANDIR TRUST (LONDON) LIMITED

Charity number: 1123000
Charity reporting is up to date (7 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 07 April 2025 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 07 April 2025 7 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2023 03 March 2025 337 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 03 March 2025 337 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2022 31 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 21 July 2023 112 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 31 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 01 June 2022 62 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 19 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 19 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window