Financial history ASAMAI MANDIR TRUST (LONDON) LIMITED

Charity number: 1123000
Charity reporting is up to date (7 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £74.16k £60.19k £60.19k £133.95k £150.18k
Total expenditure £18.74k £55.42k £25.23k £37.00k £101.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £25.00k £22.94k N/A N/A N/A