THE BOXING ACADEMY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The BAF will provide and assist in the provision of facilities, support and resources for education at the Boxing Academy Trust (reg co. no. 09876066); provide support with education, training, mentoring and healthy lifestyles for current and former pupils, and complement provision made by the school in developing effective relationships between the staff, parents and other stakeholders.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 04 July 2007: Standard registration
- LONDON BOXING ACADEMY COMMUNITY PROJECT (Previous name)
- THE BOXING ACADEMY (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Graham Robb | Trustee | 21 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Jones | Trustee | 14 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Verity Myers | Trustee | 20 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
ANNA CAIN | Trustee | 13 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Paul Buchanan | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £98.42k | £46.81k | £18.10k | £10.83k | £2.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £80.68k | £27.67k | £38.32k | £14.04k | £16.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 08 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 05 July 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 05 July 2021 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 27 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 27 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION 17 MAR 2006, AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 12 JUL 2010. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 30 APR 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11 APR 2018 as amended on 17 Sep 2019 as amended on 17 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF PUPILS AT THE SCHOOL CURRENTLY RUN BY THE BOXING ACADEMY TRUST (AN EXEMPT CHARITY WITH REGISTERED COMPANY NO. 09876066) IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (1) PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, SUPPORT AND RESOURCES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL; (2) PROVIDING EDUCATION, TRAINING, MENTORING AND HEALTHY LIFESTYLES FOR CURRENT AND FORMER PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL, TO COMPLEMENT PROVISION MADE BY THE SCHOOL OR WHERE THE SCHOOL DOES NOT MAKE SUCH PROVISION; AND (3) DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHER STAKEHOLDERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
LONDON SOUTH EAST
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Monteagle Way
LONDON
E5 8PH
- Phone:
- 02089864674
- Email:
- mail@theboxingacademy.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window