FRIENDS R US LONDON

Charity number: 1121746
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide culturally appropriate social and drama activities for children and young people in the local BME community

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023

Total income: £93,937
Total expenditure: £77,777

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • Hackney
  • Haringey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 November 2007: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
FAIGYE GOLDMAN Trustee 24 September 2012
None on record
SHANI JUST Trustee 16 June 2011
None on record
REBECCA KATZ Trustee 16 June 2011
None on record
ROSE HOFFMAN Trustee
None on record
SONIA MOSSBERG Trustee
KEREN CHASODIM LTD
Received: On time
HOT LINE MEALS SERVICE (LONDON)
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £60.35k £58.22k £49.55k £72.38k £93.94k
Total expenditure £63.00k £63.80k £12.43k £72.87k £77.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £14.00k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 14 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 14 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2022 27 September 2023 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 27 September 2023 27 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2021 30 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 30 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2020 11 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 11 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2019 11 June 2021 284 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 11 June 2021 284 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
FRIENDS R US LONDON
65-67 AMHURST PARK
LONDON
N16 5DL
Phone:
02088093857
Website:

No information available