Trustees 2ND BALSALL COMMON (METHODIST) SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 1119637

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JILL WENDY BOWMAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Daniel Robinson | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carl Davies | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Lloyd | Trustee | 24 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Burns | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Louis Burns | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Kennedy-Pearce | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stewart Paul Beck | Trustee | 08 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Garry Palmer | Trustee | 04 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Alex Dickson | Trustee | 12 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Chalklen | Trustee | 26 November 2004 |
|
|
||||
MARTYN PILLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALISON MARGARET LOWE | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.