NEWCASTLE TOY AND LEISURE LIBRARY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE PROVIDE PLAY AND LEISURE SERVICES FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITH SPECIAL NEEDS (0-18 YEARS) AND THEIR FAMILIES (PLUS SIBLINGS) IN NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE, ALSO A LOAN SERVICE OFFERING TOYS AND SPECIALISED EQUIPMENT, SATURDAY ACTIVITY CLUBS AND SCHOOL HOLIDAY PLAY AND LEISURE SESSIONS. WE EMPLOY FAMILY WORKERS WHO SUPPORT FAMILIES TO ACCESS LEISURE ACTIVITIES IN THEIR LOCAL COMMUNITIES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
Governance
- 17 September 2007: Standard registration
- 14 May 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £94.50k | £88.00k | £93.65k | £57.13k | £1 | |
|
Total expenditure | £87.39k | £90.34k | £107.22k | £95.98k | £65 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £32.00k | £27.34k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 31 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 15 MARCH 2007
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF AND EDUCATION OF LOCAL BABIES, CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITH SPECIAL NEEDS BY THE PROVISION OF THERAPEUTIC EDUCATIONAL AND STIMULATING TOYS AND EQUIPMENT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE AND ITS ENVIRONS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window