Accounts and annual returns ASSEMBLEIA DE DEUS DE LONDRES

Charity number: 1121287
Charity reporting is overdue by 102 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 102 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 102 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 10 July 2024 161 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 10 July 2024 161 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 06 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 06 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 February 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 01 February 2022 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 May 2021 100 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 11 May 2021 100 days late Download Open in new window