RADCLIFFE BOROUGH COMMUNITY TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advanced Coaching Centre Holiday Coaching Courses School Curriculum Coaching After School Coaching Birthday Parties Junior Club Matchday Visits Junior Mini-Leagues Junior Tournaments
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
Total income includes £3,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

2 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bury
Governance
- 10 February 2011: Standard registration
- RADCLIFFE BOROUGH FOOTBALL IN THE COMMUNITY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bernard Manning | Trustee | 06 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
PETER JOHN LOFTHOUSE | Trustee | 29 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.28k | £27.01k | £56.57k | £69.92k | £51.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.63k | £24.83k | £57.36k | £58.35k | £55.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.00k | £5.00k | £13.60k | £3.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 21 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 21 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 05 February 2025 | 311 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 05 February 2025 | 311 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 27 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 27 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 18 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 18 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 18 March 2022 | 352 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 18 March 2022 | 352 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19/02/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/03/2010 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 24/03/2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 26 JAN 2012
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR THE INHABITANTS OF RADCLIFFE AND SURROUNDING AREAS BY: 1 PROMOTING COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF ASSOCIATION FOOTBALL AND OTHER SPORTS CAPABLE OF IMPROVING HEALTH ('FACILITIES' IN THIS CLAUSE MEANS LAND, BUILDINGS AND EQUIPMENT AND ORGANISING SPORTING ACTIVITIES); 2 PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR SPORT, RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR SUCH PERSONS WHO HAVE A NEED FOR SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, ETHNICITY, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; AND 3 ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHARITY LAW.
Area of benefit
RADCLIFFE AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
RADCLIFFE BOROUGH F C
STAINTON PARK
COLSHAW CLOSE EAST
RADCLIFFE
MANCHESTER
M26 3PE
- Phone:
- 07772764007
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window