LLANTHONY SECUNDA PRIORY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1.To preserve for the benefit of the people of Gloucestershire and of the nation the historical architectural and constructional heritage that may exist in and around Gloucestershire in buildings of particular beauty or historical or constructional interest. In particular to manage,restore and preserve for the benefit of the public Llanthony Secunda priory in the City of Gloucester.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £25,978 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 18 June 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Crofts | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Rachel Roberts | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Grant Bowden | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Paul James | Trustee | 15 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Michael Court | Trustee | 11 June 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Peter Mark Evans | Trustee | 11 June 2020 |
|
|||||||||
Jane Crichard | Trustee | 11 June 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
GRAHAM GEORGE HOWELL | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
Martyn White | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £92.18k | £169.20k | £248.33k | £100.73k | £209.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £156.91k | £121.50k | £264.04k | £171.83k | £197.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £100 | £72.30k | £27.50k | £4.00k | £25.98k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 03 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 November 2020 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2019
(These accounts |
17 November 2020 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19/02/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/05/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/03/2014 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 26/06/2014 as amended on 15 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
1. TO PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE OF GLOUCESTERSHIRE AND OF THE NATION THE HISTORICAL ARCHITECTURAL AND CONSTRUCTIONAL HERITAGE THAT MAY EXIST IN AND AROUND GLOUCESTERSHIRE IN BUILDINGS (INCLUDING ANY STRUCTURE OR ERECTION AND ANY PART OF A BUILDING) OF PARTICULAR BEAUTY OR HISTORICAL ARCHITECTURAL OR CONSTRUCTIONAL INTEREST. IN PARTICULAR TO MANAGE, RESTORE AND PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC LLANTHONY SECUNDA PRIORY IN THE CITY OF GLOUCESTER. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL AND CONSTRUCTIONAL HERITAGE IN GLOUCESTER, IN PARTICULAR THE LLANTHONY SECUNDA PRIORY BUILDING. 3 TO SECURE (AS FAR AS REASONABLY POSSIBLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH ALL RELEVANT LAWS AND REGULATIONS) PUBLIC ACCESS TO THE LAND KNOWN AS LLANTHONY SECUNDA PRIORY IN THE CITY OF GLOUCESTER AND REGISTERED UNDER TITLE NUMBERS GR49417 AND GR143668'
Area of benefit
GLOUCESTER
Contact information
- Address:
- No information available
- Phone:
- 01452563499
- Email:
- info@llanthonysecunda.org
- Website:
-
llanthonysecunda.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window