JUS KIDZ

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide inclusive activities for disabled children and their siblings. delivering a Saturday Club, school holiday club, Friday Night youth club, advocacy for parents, training opportunities, volunteering opportunities and a safe haven for all beneficiaries.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Knowsley
Governance
- 05 December 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAULA ELIZABETH ENGLISH | Chair | 23 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Amy Tomlinson | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
GILLESPIE ROBERT JOHN | Trustee | 27 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £104.03k | £96.77k | £104.90k | £14.20k | £65.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £93.22k | £77.53k | £89.09k | £85.17k | £69.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.48k | £27.79k | £10.91k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 February 2024 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 March 2022 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 March 2022 | 45 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 March 2021 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 March 2021 | 38 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 MARCH 2007.
Charitable objects
3. THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE: TO RELIEVE ANY CHARITABLE NEEDS OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DIFFICULTIES AND THEIR PARENTS AND CARERS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE: LOCALLY IN MERSEYSIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
NORTHWOOD COMMUNITY CENTRE
GILESCROFT AVENUE
LIVERPOOL
L33 9TW
- Phone:
- 01515463622
- Email:
- jus_kidz@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window