Financial history WOKING HOMES

Charity number: 1120447
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.22m £2.20m £2.02m £2.54m £3.16m
Total expenditure £2.13m £2.18m £2.27m £2.41m £2.73m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £146.61k £98.00k £803 N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £21.41k £18.53k £19.45k £198.00k £378.45k
Income - Other trading activities £20.02k £27.87k £24.13k £26.57k £20.61k
Income - Charitable activities £1.78m £1.72m £1.51m £1.87m £2.32m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £392.42k £287.23k £366.10k £436.09k £441.92k
Income - Other £0 £146.61k £98.30k £803 £0
Income - Legacies £310 £500 £0 £183.54k £365.12k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.93m £1.97m £2.04m £2.17m £2.48m
Expenditure - Raising funds £66.02k £67.61k £88.91k £84.21k £63.66k
Expenditure - Governance £8.80k £9.00k £9.00k £10.00k £11.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £45.23k £45.96k £52.23k £47.32k £46.94k
Expenditure - Other £130.53k £135.16k £140.50k £148.04k £180.96k