Trustees MARTHA AND MARY ASSOCIATION
Charity Number: 1120606

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ELIZABETH SCREEN | Chair | 29 September 2016 |
|
|||||
Beryl Wood | Trustee | 22 July 2022 |
|
|||||
David John Forster | Trustee | 10 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anne Cowell | Trustee | 10 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Brumwell | Trustee | 24 July 2018 |
|
|||||
Anne Abbott | Trustee | 16 September 2016 |
|
|||||
David Wells | Trustee | 15 July 2015 |
|
|||||
Stephen Brownlee | Trustee | 15 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
REV Jonathan Lawson | Trustee | 15 July 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.