FAMILY SUPPORT LINK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE GOOD MENTAL AND EMOTIONAL HEALTH OF FAMILIES OF PERSONS WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM ADDICTION TO DRUGS AND OTHER SUBSTANCES. IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF A TELEPHONE HELP LINE AND CENTRE PROVIDING INFORMATION, ADVICE AND SUPPORT. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ISSUES FACED BY THE FAMILIES OF PERSONS WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM ADDICTION.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Total income includes £160,000 from 1 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 23 May 2007: Standard registration
- 06 September 2022: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 06 September 2022: Funds transferred to 1196808 FAMILY SUPPORT LINK
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £274.90k | £267.53k | £290.89k | £331.86k | £313.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £254.94k | £270.81k | £334.75k | £315.62k | £330.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £160.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £162.50k | £160.00k | £10.45k | £170.17k | £160.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 September 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 07 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 07 November 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 APRIL 2007
Charitable objects
1) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE GOOD MENTAL AND EMOTIONAL HEALTH OF FAMILIES OF PERSONS WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM ADDICTION TO DRUGS AND OTHER SUBSTANCES, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF A HELPLINE AND CENTRE PROVIDING INFORMATION ADVICE AND SUPPORT 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ISSUES FACED BY THE FAMILIES OF PERSONS WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM ADDICTION TO DRUGS AND OTHER SUBSTANCES.
Area of benefit
NORTHAMPTONSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window