NAVJIVAN VADIL KENDRA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities organised, usually on a weekly basis, to improve the welfare and condition of life of members of various age groups, those who may be infirm and those who are physically challenged. Also facilitate financial assistance, information,guidance and workshops to enhance members' social, cultural, leisure, spiritual and general well-being requirements.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Barnet
- Brent
- Harrow
Governance
- 11 December 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Vinodchandra Prabhudas Parekh President | Chair | 01 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
Pradip Patel | Trustee | 22 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shirishkumar Mithani | Trustee | 22 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karsan Bhudia | Trustee | 22 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jaykumar Shah Treasurer | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
HARSHVADAN MANDALIA | Trustee | 02 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
KUSUM DHANVANT PUNATER | Trustee | 02 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
KISHOR DOSHI | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Purnima Mehta Secretary | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|||||
Dr MAHENDRA SHAMJI VORA | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Chiman Sheth | Trustee | 14 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
HASMUKHLAL PRANLAL VALLABHJI PAREKH | Trustee | 09 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
PRAFULCHANDRA GULABRAI SHAH | Trustee | 09 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
ELLA SHAH | Trustee | 09 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr VINOD KAPASHI OBE | Trustee | 23 May 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £59.00k | £44.40k | £2.22k | £30.79k | £70.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.84k | £18.23k | £4.49k | £38.55k | £86.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 November 2023 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 November 2023 | 21 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 JANUARY 2007 AS AMENDED 5 JULY 2007
Charitable objects
1 TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIVE. 2 TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND SICKNESS AND PROMOTE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, ADVICE AND SUPPORT ON SUBJECTS INCLUDING HEALTH AND WELFARE RIGHTS. 3 TO PROMOTE EQUALITY OF OPPORTUNITY AND GOOD RACE RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT ETHICAL/RELIGIOUS GROUPS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, BRENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 Haywood Close
PINNER
HA5 3LQ
- Phone:
- 02089541859
- Email:
- nvkendra@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window