FRIENDS OF CHANCET WOOD CHILDREN'S HOME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the provision of leisure, outdoor play and educational facilities for disabled children receiving a residential short break service at Chancet Wood Children's Home, plus improve the facilities and environment, and also provide better moving and handling equipment to make their stay more comfortable.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 10 July 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANET LORRAINE NUTTALL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Debbie Miles | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jane bennett | Trustee | 04 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Cocks | Trustee | 04 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Hall | Trustee | 17 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
LISA MARY SHAW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANE HARRISON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD GREEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.43k | £3.21k | £5.28k | £3.89k | £2.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.33k | £1.06k | £10.40k | £800 | £5.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 JANUARY 2007
Charitable objects
1/ TO ADVANCE THE PROVISION OF LEISURE AND EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES FOR DISABLED CHILDREN RECEIVING A RESIDENTIAL RESPITE SERVICE AT CHANCET WOOD CHILDREN'S HOME THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO BUILD A SENSORY AND SOFT PLAY ANNEX AT THE CHILDREN'S HOME. 2/ TO ADVANCE THE PROVISION OF LEISURE AND EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES FOR DISABLED CHILDREN RECEIVING A RESIDENTIAL RESPITE SERVICE AT CHANCET WOOD CHILDREN'S HOME THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE FOR OTHER FUTURE PROJECTS THAT ENHANCE THE CHILDREN'S LEISURE AND EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES AT THE HOME.
Area of benefit
SOUTH YORKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Chancet Wood Childrens Home
Chancet Wood Drive
SHEFFIELD
S8 7TR
- Phone:
- 01142746459
- Email:
- lisa.shaw@sheffield.gov.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window