Accounts and annual returns PARTAKE

Charity Number: 1120512
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2011 28 January 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2010 12 December 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2009 14 July 2010 164 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 29 January 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2008 20 February 2009 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 29 September 2008 On Time