PARTAKE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Partake is a community visual arts charity based in Wakefield, who run, develop and manage art projects with a diverse range of communities and groups. Our aim is to get people involved with the use of art. We work in partnership with many organisations and groups including Consort Healthcare - who we run a project with the to create art works with to display in the local hospitals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- City Of Wakefield
Governance
- 09 August 2007: Standard registration
- 01 February 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.66k | £25.55k | £5.51k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.93k | £26.12k | £13.45k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 28 January 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 12 December 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 14 July 2010 | 164 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 29 January 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 20 February 2009 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 29 September 2008 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION, INCORPORATED 28 NOVEMBER 2006, AS AMENDED 11 JULY 2007
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE USUAL ARTS AND CRAFTS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window