ZAMBIA EDUCATIONAL SUPPORT TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We support rural Zambian schools with improved teaching resources, classrooms, water supply, gardens.These schools have many orphans and vulnerable children,& most of the teachers are volunteers.We sponsor students at teacher training college.We work closely with the Communities from the outset. We facilitate twinning links between Zambian and UK schools.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Zambia
Governance
- 04 July 2007: Standard registration
- 15 December 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- ZEST - UK (Working name)
- SCHOOL TWINNING FRIENDS (ZAMBIA - UK) (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 05/04/2012 | 05/04/2013 | 05/04/2014 | 05/04/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.23k | £34.26k | £17.44k | £19.16k | £9.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.61k | £34.19k | £21.02k | £23.28k | £6.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2015 | 16 December 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2014 | 07 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2013 | 05 December 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 10/02/2007 AS AMENDED ON 04/06/2007 AS AMENDED ON 14/08/2008 AS AMENDED ON 16/11/2012
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF NEED AND ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY AMONGST SCHOOL AGE CHILDREN IN RURAL ZAMBIA
Area of benefit
ZAMBIA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window