Trustees AXBRIDGE CHURCH OF ENGLAND FIRST SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1120886

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Phoebe Bright | Chair | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christina Wilcox | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew McLeod | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Clarkson | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Odd | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
LORNA ADAMS | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.