JONNY KENNEDY NORTH EAST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To raise vital funds to EB sufferers and their families, medical equipment, holidays, respite care, computers, wheelchairs if required. We send birthday cards/presents also Christmas cards/presents. We organise supermarket bagpacks, raffles, tombolas, street collections, we have also inquired about making a will to charity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Cardiff
- Denbighshire
- Manchester City
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- Australia
- United States
Governance
- 21 June 2007: Standard registration
- 02 February 2017: Removed (Funds spent (by trustees))
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £71.30k | £58.45k | £45.90k | £49.51k | £67.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.50k | £52.93k | £38.89k | £39.93k | £52.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | 20 December 2016 | 50 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 18 February 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | 12 August 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 08 May 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | 20 January 2014 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 4 JUNE 2007
Charitable objects
1 TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF THE SUFFERERS OF EPIDERMOLYSIS BULLOSA AND THEIR CARERS, IN PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, MEDICAL EQUIPMENT AND OTHER SUPPORT 2 TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO EPIDERMOLYSIS BULLOSA FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND TO PUBLISH THE RESULTS
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window