Financial history WAYNE RENOWDEN THOMAS

Charity Number: 1119033
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £32.84k £38.33k £40.81k £39.45k £34.07k
Total expenditure £32.48k £36.07k £40.23k £40.94k £35.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A