AFRICAN CARIBBEAN LEUKAEMIA TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve and support persons, in particular those from African, Caribbean, Mixed Race and Ethnic Minority communities suffering with Leukaemia or any other bone marrow diseases and in particular by the provision of counselling and encouraging people to donate bone marrow, blood & organs. To educate the public about the needs of persons suffering from Leukaemia or any other bone marrow diseases.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income includes £24,200 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 June 2007: Standard registration
- 07 May 2025: Funds received from 1160236 TEAM MARGOT FOUNDATION
- ACLT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charlotte Dawkins | Chair | 19 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dominique De-Gale | Trustee | 19 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Julien | Trustee | 07 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Monica Edith Finne Meade | Trustee | 03 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jeremie Alamazani | Trustee | 17 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dean Forbes | Trustee | 05 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
LAVERNE WALKER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £271.39k | £266.91k | £530.77k | £460.14k | £349.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £234.09k | £178.65k | £293.29k | £372.08k | £397.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £15.58k | £31.96k | £31.27k | £36.60k | £24.20k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £530.72k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £52 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £245.68k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £47.61k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 10 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 10 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 08 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 08 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 09 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 09 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 15 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 15 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 NOVEMBER 2003.
Charitable objects
1) TO RELIEVE AND SUPPORT PERSONS, IN PARTICULAR THOSE FROM AFRICAN AND CARIBBEAN COMMUNITIES SUFFERING WITH LEUKAEMIA OR ANY OTHER BONE MARROW DISEASES AND IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND ENCOURAGING PEOPLE TO DONATE BONE MARROW. 2) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC ABOUT THE NEEDS OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM LEUKAEMIA OR ANY OTHER BONE MARROW DISEASES. 3) TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE ANY FORM OF RESEARCH INTO LEUKAEMIA OR ANY OTHER FORM OF BONE MARROW DISEASES AND TO DISSEMINATE AND MAKE PUBLIC THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH. 4) ANY OTHER PURPOSES CHARITABLE BY LAW, IN PARTICULAR, THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH IN THE GENERAL PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR AMONGST THE BENEFICIAL CLASS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
2A Garnet Road
THORNTON HEATH
Surrey
CR7 8RD
- Phone:
- 02037577700
- Email:
- info@aclt.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window