THE FRIENDS OF RNLI (UK) LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The saving of lives, the promotion of safety and provision of relief from disaster at sea or on inland waters, in particular by supporting the Royal National Lifeboat Institution in such ways and in such manner as shall be exclusively charitable.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 May 2007: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Catherine Louise Eardley | Trustee | 16 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA ROOK | Trustee | 20 November 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 05 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 18 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 11 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 16 August 2021 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 12 August 2020 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 SEPTEMBER 2005.
Charitable objects
THE SAVING OF LIVES, THE PROMOTION OF SAFETY AND PROVISION OF RELIEF FROM DISASTER AT SEA OR ON INLAND WATERS, IN PARTICULAR BY SUPPORTING THE ROYAL NATIONAL LIFEBOAT INSTITUTION (UK REGISTERED CHARITY NUMBER 209603) IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH MANNER AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE (AS DEFINED IN ARTICLE 2.1(E) OF THE ARTICLES).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
R N L I
West Quay Road
Poole
BH15 1HZ
- Phone:
- 01202663212
- Email:
- james_vaughan@rnli.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window