THE BRITISH THYROID ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotes research and interest in thyroid field
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Scotland
Governance
- 13 June 2007: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EARN GAN | Trustee | 28 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jackie Gilbert | Trustee | 24 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Professor Onyebuchi Okosieme | Trustee | 24 March 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.40k | £3.33k | £4.03k | £21.41k | £20.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.04k | £1.33k | £7.24k | £14.48k | £18.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 28 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 29 December 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 24 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 MARCH 2007.
Charitable objects
THE AIM OF THE ASSOCIATION IS TO PROMOTE THE STUDY AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE THYROID GLAND AND ITS DISORDERS AND TO PROMOTE A HIGH STANDARD OF CARE FOR PEOPLE WITH THYROID DISEASES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ROYAL VICTORIA INFIRMARY
QUEEN VICTORIA ROAD
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE1 4LP
- Phone:
- 00
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window