AMAZON HEART TRUST UK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promote physical and mental wellbeing of women diagnosed with breast cancer by: Arranging peer support adventures, sometimes in partnership with other charities. Development of other peer support structiures, and linking to global networks of women in similar situations. The making of grants to organisations and groups providing services in line with the trust's objects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 03 May 2007: Standard registration
- 12 April 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £926 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2008 | 30 April 2009 | 61 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2008 | 26 April 2009 | 57 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED 20 APRIL 2006
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF WOMEN - PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, YOUNG WOMEN - IN THE UK DIAGNOSED WITH BREAST CANCER THROUGH: I THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A PROGRAMME OF PEER SUPPORT EVENTS PROVIDING POSITIVE EXPERIENCES FOR PARTICIPATING BREAST CANCER SURVIVORS AND INCREASING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THE CONDITION ESPECIALLY AMONGST YOUNG WOMEN; II THE DEVELOPMENT OF OTHER PEER SUPPORT STRUCTURES FOR SURVIVORS, INCLUDING PARTICIPATION IN THE CREATION OF A GLOBAL PEER SUPPORT NETWORK FOR SURVIVORS OF ALL NATIONALITIES; III THE MAKING OF GRANTS AND DONATIONS TO SUCH CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS AND VOLUNTARY GROUPS OR PROJECTS WORKING IN THIS FIELD AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT LIMITATIONS, TO THOSE PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, SUPPORT (ESPECIALLY PEER SUPPORT OPPORTUNITIES), EDUCATION, PRACTICAL ADVICE, TREATMENT OR CARE TO THIS GROUP OF BENEFICIARIES: ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND THE MEDICAL AND CARING PROFESSIONS IN ISSUES CONCERNING THE CONDITION, ESPECIALLY AS IT AFFECTS YOUNG WOMEN.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED, IN PRACTICE NATIONAL & OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window