LONDON SUSTAINABILITY EXCHANGE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
London Sustainability Exchange accelerates the transition to a sustainable London by connecting and motivating people. As a charity we work in partnership with business, government and the voluntary sector to reduce London's environmental footprint, improve the lives of London's disadvantaged communities, and improve the health of Londoners.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
Total income includes £45,643 from 4 government contract(s) and £1,973 from 1 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 28 December 2007: Standard registration
- 10 November 2021: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 10 November 2021: Funds transferred to 1026148 GLOBAL ACTION PLAN
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £316.08k | £306.38k | £239.90k | £277.57k | £255.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £326.31k | £350.23k | £262.66k | £300.89k | £235.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £112.23k | £92.43k | £7.87k | £45.25k | £45.64k | |
|
Income from government grants | £63.95k | £85.97k | £5.67k | £29.02k | £1.97k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 17 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 17 December 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 05 November 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 05 November 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15 JUNE 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 30 NOVEMBER 2007.
Charitable objects
3. THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: 3.1 THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT IN GREATER LONDON AND ELSEWHERE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: 3.1.1 THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF NATURAL RESOURCES; 3.1.2 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES; 3.1.3 THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION; 3.1.4 THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH 3.2 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN SUBJECTS RELATED TO SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT AND THE PROTECTION, ENHANCEMENT AND REHABILITATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND TO PROMOTE STUDY AND RESEARCH IN SUCH SUBJECTS INCLUDING THE IMPACT OF GREATER LONDON AND OTHER MAJOR CITIES ON THE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT OF THE WORLD PROVIDED THAT THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH STUDY ARE DISSEMINATED TO THE PUBLIC AT LARGE. 3.3 THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF NATURAL RESOURCES. 3.4 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES. 3.5 THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH 3.6 IN THIS CLAUSE, "SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT" MEANS DEVELOPMENT THAT MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS.
Area of benefit
IN GREATER LONDON AND ELSWWHERE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window